Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 215 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 16194 Month
» 211648 Year
» 1096029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 753 m/e 03/1899
LNER (1924) 9753 m/e 02/1926
LNER (1946) 5311 m/e 11/1946
BR 65311 m/e 03/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1955 HAIG

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1899
J3604/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal Fri 29/11/1963 off Polmont (65K)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 64 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 19/05/1951
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1952
64E Polmont m/e 09/06/1956
65F Grangemouth 5w/e 07/09/1963
65K Polmont 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn 29/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 64E Polmont 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 10/08/1963
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 65K Polmont 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
04/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
02/1926 Vacuum Ejector fitted
10/1945 Steam Brake fitted
10/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 753
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
04/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
04/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9753    
10/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
10/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5311    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65311    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
06/1955 Naming Named 'HAIG'    
09/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (64E)    
07/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65311 from Polmont (65K)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (65K)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev