Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 752   01/1899
LNER (1924) 9752   08/1925
LNER (1946) 5310   07/1946
BR 65310   07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1899
J3612/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Fort William (63B)
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 14/03/1959
61C Keith 4w/e 11/04/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 29/07/1961
65J Stirling 4w/e 21/10/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 14/03/1959
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 11/04/1959
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 29/07/1961
ALLOC 65J Stirling 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
12/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
07/1949 Westinghouse Brake removed
07/1949 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 752
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9752    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5310    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
07/1949 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
07/1949 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65310    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
29/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (65J)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65310 from Fort William (63B)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev