Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 937 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7944 Week
» 14078 Month
» 241962 Year
» 1463527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 751 m/e 01/1899
LNER (1924) 9751 m/e 02/1926
LNER (1946) 5309 m/e 11/1946
BR 65309 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1899
J3607/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 65 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1899
PTH Perth (LNER) 01/01/1948
64F Bathgate 4w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PTH Perth (LNER) 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 22/10/1960
WDN   29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
07/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
01/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
01/1946 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1950 Inverurie Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. SLS/195010
04/07/1961 Inverurie Works (Erecting Shops) Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. SLS/196108
17/09/1961 Swindon Works (Triangle) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 751
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9751    
01/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
01/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5309    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65309    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 65309 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev