Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 478 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 478 Week
» 15189 Month
» 157143 Year
» 1041524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 749 m/e 01/1899
LNER (1924) 9749 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 5307 m/e 10/1946
BR 65307 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1899
J3611/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal During 12/1963 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 64 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STG Stirling 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 14/07/1962
64F Bathgate 4w/e 03/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper w/e 15/01/1949
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 6w/e 18/08/1962
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 10/08/1963
WDN   28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
11/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
02/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
02/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 749
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9749    
02/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
02/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5307    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65307    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65307 from Bathgate (64F)    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev