Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4117 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17523 Week
» 70539 Month
» 190066 Year
» 3216919 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
749 |
m/e |
01/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9749 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5307 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65307 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
02/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 61502, 4484, 5232/57, 65281, 5307, 65340. ex L.M.S. No. 4251. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 749 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9749 |
|
|
02/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5307 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65307 |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
03/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65307 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|