Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 150 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15762 Week
» 114407 Month
» 317071 Year
» 3343924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
748 |
m/e |
01/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9748 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5306 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65306 |
on |
24/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Grangemouth (65F) |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
05/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
03/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. |
SLS/195008 |
18/08/1961 |
Grangemouth MPD (65F) (Stored) |
Stored on 18th August were-45177/8, 57265, 64593, 65306, whilst 55214 was stored some distance from the shed. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 748 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9748 |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5306 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
24/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65306 |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
16/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65306 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|