Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 870 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5823 Week
» 21802 Month
» 217256 Year
» 1101637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 748 m/e 01/1899
LNER (1924) 9748 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 5306 m/e 10/1946
BR 65306 m/e 24/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1899
J3605/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Grangemouth (65F)
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 11/03/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 11/03/1961
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
03/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
03/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 748
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9748    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5306    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65306    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65306 from Grangemouth (65F)    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev