Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 747 m/e 12/1898
LNER (1924) 9747 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 5305 m/e 11/1946
BR 65305 m/e 03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1898
J3612/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal w/e Mon 26/02/1962 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 14/03/1959
61C Keith 4w/e 12/03/1960
64F Bathgate 4w/e 06/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 26/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   10/02/1958
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 14/03/1959
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 12/03/1960
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 26/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
12/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
06/1943 Steam Brake fitted
06/1943 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as NBR Number 747
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9747    
06/1943 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
06/1943 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5305    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65305    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
26/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65305 from Bathgate (64F)    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev