Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 746   10/1898
LNER (1924) 9746   07/1924
LNER (1946) 5304   12/1946
BR 65304   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3610/1898
J3611/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1898
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Stirling (STG)
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 64 yrs , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 8w/e 22/12/1956
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 16/03/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 13/04/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 26/08/1961
65J Stirling 4w/e 21/10/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 65J Stirling 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
11/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed
12/1944 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1898 To Service To service as NBR Number 746
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9746    
12/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
12/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5304    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65304    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
13/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (65J)    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65304 from Stirling (STG)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev