Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 165 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2026 Week
» 23008 Month
» 164962 Year
» 1049343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 745 m/e 10/1898
LNER (1924) 9745 m/e 07/1924
LNER (1946) 5303 m/e 07/1946
BR 65303 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3610/1898
J3601/1920
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1898
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 64 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61A Kittybrewster m/e 09/06/1956
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 26/08/1961
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 26/08/1961
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1920 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
01/1920 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
11/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
11/1946 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1898 To Service To service as NBR Number 745
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
01/1920 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
01/1920 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9745    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5303    
11/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65303    
09/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65303 from St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev