Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 101 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2440 Week
» 8574 Month
» 236458 Year
» 1458023 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 742 m/e 10/1898
LNER (1924) 9742 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 5300 m/e 10/1946
BR 65300 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3610/1898
J3604/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1898
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Fort William (63B)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1898
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EFD Eastfield w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC FTW   w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   10/02/1958
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
04/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1945 Steam Brake fitted
03/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/06/1961 Fort William MPD On 16th June, 44255 (the 'snow-plough' engine) was noted ex store and acting as station pilot. 65300/13 are still in use. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1898 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 742
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
04/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
04/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9742    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5300    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65300    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65300 from Fort William (63B)    

prev prev