Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 45 Today
» 788 Yesterday
» 45 Week
» 13078 Month
» 235479 Year
» 1119860 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 726 m/e 07/1897
LNER (1924) 9726 m/e 03/1924
LNER (1946) 5297 m/e 10/1946
BR 65297 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1897
J3606/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1897
Withdrawal Mon 03/01/1966 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 68 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PTH Perth (LNER) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 8w/e 27/10/1956
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/04/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
68B Dumfries 4w/e 26/08/1961
65D Dawsholm 6w/e 30/12/1961
68B Dumfries 4w/e 24/03/1962
67B Hurlford 4w/e 14/07/1962
64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/07/1963
64F Bathgate 4w/e 06/07/1963
   Withdrawn 03/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 30/04/1950
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/04/1959
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 26/08/1961
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 6w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 07/04/1962
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 5w/e 13/07/1963
WDN   03/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
06/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1947 Steam Brake fitted
12/1947 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1897 To Service To service as NBR Number 726
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
06/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
06/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9726    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5297    
12/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
12/1947 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65297    
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Outside - awaiting shopping. SLS 7/1962 Link
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65297 from Bathgate (64F)    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev