Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 871 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5824 Week
» 21803 Month
» 217257 Year
» 1101638 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 724 m/e 07/1897
LNER (1924) 9724 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 5295 m/e 12/1946
BR 65295 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1897
J3611/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1897
Withdrawal Wed 05/04/1961 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 06/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 63 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 5w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn 05/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead w/e 17/03/1951
ALLOC 65C Parkhead m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   05/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
11/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
06/1949 Westinghouse Brake removed
06/1949 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1897 To Service To service as NBR Number 724
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9724    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5295    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65295    
06/1949 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
06/1949 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65295 from Parkhead (65C)    
06/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev