|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/06/1961 | Inverurie Works | Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. | SLS/196107 |
04/07/1961 | Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1897 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 724 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
||
11/1919 | Modification | Diagram 81 boiler fitted | ||
11/1919 | Modification | Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted | ||
01/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9724 | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5295 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65295 | ||
06/1949 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
06/1949 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
17/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
05/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65295 from Parkhead (65C) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |