Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 735 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5929 Week
» 12980 Month
» 235381 Year
» 1119762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 719 m/e 04/1897
LNER (1924) 9719 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 5290 m/e 11/1946
BR 65290 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3604/1897
J3605/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal Thu 01/08/1963 off Hawick (64G)
Scrapping During 03/1964 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 66 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64F Bathgate 8w/e 22/12/1956
   Withdrawn 01/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   01/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
05/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1947 Westinghouse Brake removed
03/1947 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as NBR Number 719
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9719    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5290    
03/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1947 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65290    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65290 from Hawick (64G)    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Inverkeithing    

prev prev