Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4178 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17584 Week
» 70600 Month
» 190127 Year
» 3216980 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
719 |
m/e |
04/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9719 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5290 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65290 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/08/1963 off Hawick (64G) |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1897 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64F |
|
Bathgate |
8w/e |
22/12/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/08/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
05/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
03/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 62059, 2248, 64490/91, 5245/85/87, 65290, 5310, 65316, ex L.M.S. Nos. 645, 17267, 17302, 17654. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 719 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9719 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5290 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65290 |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
01/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65290 from Hawick (64G) |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Inverkeithing |
|
|