Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 872 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5825 Week
» 21804 Month
» 217258 Year
» 1101639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 717 m/e 04/1897
LNER (1924) 9717 m/e 12/1925
LNER (1946) 5288 m/e 10/1946
BR 65288 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3604/1897
J3602/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1967 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 70 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn 05/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   05/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
02/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1943 Westinghouse Brake removed
12/1943 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as NBR Number 717
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
02/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
02/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9717    
12/1943 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
12/1943 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5288    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65288    
17/08/1954 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65288 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev