Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 505 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 1370 Week
» 14403 Month
» 236804 Year
» 1121185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 716 m/e 12/1896
LNER (1924) 9716 m/e 04/1924
LNER (1946) 5287 m/e 10/1946
BR 65287 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1896
J3605/1923
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1896
Withdrawal Thu 27/06/1963 off Grangemouth (65F)
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 66 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 11/05/1963
   Withdrawn 27/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 5w/e 13/10/1962
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 08/06/1963
WDN   27/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1923 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1923 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1896 To Service To service as NBR Number 716
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1923 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1923 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9716    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5287    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65287    
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65287 from Grangemouth (65F)    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev