Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 904 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7911 Week
» 14045 Month
» 241929 Year
» 1463494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 714 m/e 11/1896
LNER (1924) 9714 m/e 01/1926
LNER (1946) 5285 m/e 10/1946
BR 65285 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3611/1896
J3611/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1896
Withdrawal Fri 29/11/1963 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 67 yrs , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1896
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 3w/e 29/09/1962
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 11/05/1963
   Withdrawn 29/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 5w/e 13/10/1962
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 5w/e 08/06/1963
WDN   29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
11/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 62059, 2248, 64490/91, 5245/85/87, 65290, 5310, 65316, ex L.M.S. Nos. 645, 17267, 17302, 17654. SLS/194908
17/06/1961 Inverurie Works Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1896 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 714
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9714    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5285    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65285    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
29/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65285 from Dawsholm (65D)    

prev prev