Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 215 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 16194 Month
» 211648 Year
» 1096029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 711 m/e 11/1896
LNER (1924) 9711 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 5282 m/e 06/1946
BR 65282 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3611/1896
J3605/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1896
Withdrawal Mon 03/01/1966 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 69 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 03/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KIT Kittybrewster 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC BGT Bathgate w/e 28/12/1946
WDN   03/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
05/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1896 To Service To service as NBR Number 711
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9711    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5282    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65282    
17/08/1954 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65282 from Bathgate (64F)    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev