Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1003 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8010 Week
» 14144 Month
» 242028 Year
» 1463593 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 711 m/e 11/1896
LNER (1924) 9711 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 5282 m/e 06/1946
BR 65282 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3611/1896
J3605/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1896
Withdrawal Mon 03/01/1966 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 69 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1896
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 03/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BGT Bathgate w/e 28/12/1946
WDN   w/e 18/07/1965
WDN   03/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Inverurie Works Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. SLS/195008
04/07/1961 Inverurie Works (Erecting Shops) Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1896 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 711
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9711    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5282    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65282    
03/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65282 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev