Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 710   06/1896
LNER (1924) 9710   07/1925
LNER (1946) 5281   06/1946
BR 65281   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3606/1896
J3603/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1896
Withdrawal During 07/1961 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 08/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 65 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STG Stirling 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64F Bathgate 4w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper w/e 15/01/1949
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 22/10/1960
WDN   13/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1896 To Service To service as NBR Number 710
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9710    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5281    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65281    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65281 from Bathgate (64F)    
08/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev