Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 576 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3971 Week
» 19950 Month
» 215404 Year
» 1099785 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 709 m/e 06/1896
LNER (1924) 9709 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 5280 m/e 11/1946
BR 65280 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3606/1896
J3603/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1896
Withdrawal w/e Mon 21/05/1962 off Polmont (65K)
Scrapping During 06/1962 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 65 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64E Polmont 8w/e 22/12/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 21/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64E Polmont 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   w/e 21/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1896 To Service To service as NBR Number 709
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9709    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5280    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65280    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (64E)    
21/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65280 from Polmont (65K)    
06/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    
03/06/1962 Sightings At Bo'ness: In store SLS 7/1962 Link

prev prev