Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 576 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3971 Week
» 19950 Month
» 215404 Year
» 1099785 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 706 m/e 06/1896
LNER (1924) 9706 m/e 09/1924
LNER (1946) 5277 m/e 10/1946
BR 65277 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3606/1896
J3606/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1896
Withdrawal Thu 06/06/1963 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Connels (Coatbridge)
Service Life 67 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 4w/e 26/09/1959
64F Bathgate 4w/e 06/05/1961
   Withdrawn 06/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   06/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
06/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1896 To Service To service as NBR Number 706
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
06/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
06/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9706    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5277    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65277    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65277 from Bathgate (64F)    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Connels: Coatbridge    

prev prev