Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
280 |
m/e |
03/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9280 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5273 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65273 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 07/11/1963 off Ardrossan (67D) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
04/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1893 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 280 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9280 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5273 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65273 |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
07/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65273 from Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|