Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 476 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 476 Week
» 15187 Month
» 157141 Year
» 1041522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 181 m/e 03/1893
LNER (1924) 9181 m/e 04/1924
LNER (1946) 5270 m/e 06/1946
BR 65270 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1893
J3607/1915
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1893
Withdrawal During 02/1958 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 03/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 64 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 4w/e 06/07/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   14/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1915 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
07/1915 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1893 To Service To service as NBR Number 181
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1915 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1915 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9181    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5270    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65270    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65270 from Parkhead (65C)    
03/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev