Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 47 Today
» 788 Yesterday
» 47 Week
» 13080 Month
» 235481 Year
» 1119862 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 180 m/e 01/1893
LNER (1924) 9180 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 5275 m/e 09/1946
BR 65275 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1893
J3603/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1893
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Grangemouth (65F)
Scrapping During 03/1964 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 69 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64G Hawick 4w/e 02/08/1958
65K Polmont 4w/e 27/01/1962
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64G Hawick 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 65K Polmont 5w/e 03/02/1962
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 3w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
03/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1893 To Service To service as NBR Number 180
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9180    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5275    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65275    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (65K)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65275 from Grangemouth (65F)    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Inverkeithing    

prev prev