Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 989 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7996 Week
» 14130 Month
» 242014 Year
» 1463579 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 358 m/e 07/1892
LNER (1924) 9358 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 5267 m/e 03/1946
BR 65267 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1892
J3610/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal Sat 19/11/1966 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 74 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1892
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/11/1955
61C Keith 4w/e 12/05/1956
64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn 19/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/11/1955
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   19/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
10/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/07/1963 Inverurie Works (Shopped) Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 358
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9358    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5267    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65267    
26/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
19/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65267 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev