Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 478 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 478 Week
» 15189 Month
» 157143 Year
» 1041524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 358 m/e 07/1892
LNER (1924) 9358 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 5267 m/e 03/1946
BR 65267 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1892
J3610/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal During 11/1966 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 74 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/11/1955
61C Keith 4w/e 12/05/1956
64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/11/1955
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   19/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
10/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as NBR Number 358
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9358    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5267    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65267    
26/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65267 from Bathgate (64F)    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev