Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 161 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2022 Week
» 23004 Month
» 164958 Year
» 1049339 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 689 m/e 03/1892
LNER (1924) 9689 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 5260 m/e 09/1946
BR 65260 m/e 03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1892
J3612/1915
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3779
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1892
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 70 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
HIRE Bairds & Scottish Steel Ltd., Gartsherrie   4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 17/05/1952
HIRE B. & S. S. Coy., Gartsherrie   4w/e 19/03/1955
WDN   w/e 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1915 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
12/1915 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1892 To Service To service as NBR Number 689
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3779
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1915 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1915 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9689    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5260    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65260    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65260 from Kipps (65E)    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev