Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 46 Today
» 788 Yesterday
» 46 Week
» 13079 Month
» 235480 Year
» 1119861 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 686 m/e 02/1892
LNER (1924) 9686 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 5257 m/e 10/1946
BR 65257 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3602/1892
J3607/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3776
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1892
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Grangemouth (65F)
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 70 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 07/04/1962
WDN   w/e 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
07/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1892 To Service To service as NBR Number 686
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3776
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9686    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5257    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65257    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65257 from Grangemouth (65F)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev