Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18270 Week
» 71286 Month
» 190813 Year
» 3217666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
683 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9683 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5254 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65254 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3773 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 24/04/1951 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1892 |
BGT |
|
Bathgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/04/1951 |
NER |
|
|
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
52C |
|
Blaydon |
w/e |
24/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
NER |
|
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
w/e |
24/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1915 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
05/1915 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
02/1946 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1946 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 683 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3773 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9683 |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5254 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65254 |
|
|
24/04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65254 from Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
24/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|