Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 681 m/e 02/1892
LNER (1924) 9681 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 5252 m/e 10/1946
BR 65252 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3602/1892
J3603/1917
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3771
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1892
Withdrawal During 05/1960 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 68 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 20/01/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   06/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1917 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1917 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1892 To Service To service as NBR Number 681
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3771
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1917 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1917 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9681    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5252    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65252    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
05/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    
05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65252 from Thornton Junction (62A)    

prev prev