Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 680 m/e 02/1892
LNER (1924) 9680 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 5251 m/e 06/1946
BR 65251 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3602/1892
J3602/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3770
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1892
Withdrawal During 11/1963 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 71 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/05/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 11/02/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 11/02/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   28/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
02/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1892 To Service To service as NBR Number 680
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3770
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
02/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
02/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9680    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5251    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65251    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65251 from Bathgate (64F)    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev