Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 165 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2026 Week
» 23008 Month
» 164962 Year
» 1049343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 678 m/e 02/1892
LNER (1924) 9678 m/e 03/1926
LNER (1946) 5249 m/e 09/1946
BR 65249 m/e 03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3602/1892
J3607/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3768
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1892
Withdrawal During 10/1960 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 11/1960 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 68 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
HIRE Gartsherrie Iron Works   4w/e 18/05/1957
EXHIRE 65E Kipps 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   13/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
07/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1892 To Service To service as NBR Number 678
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3768
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9678    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5249    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65249    
10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65249 from Kipps (65E)    
11/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev