Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3704 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17110 Week
» 70126 Month
» 189653 Year
» 3216506 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
677 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9677 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5245 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65245 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4396 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 25/05/1951 off Kipps (65E) |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1891 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KPS |
Kipps |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1917 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
03/1917 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 62059, 2248, 64490/91, 5245/85/87, 65290, 5310, 65316, ex L.M.S. Nos. 645, 17267, 17302, 17654. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 677 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4396 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9677 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5245 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65245 |
|
|
25/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65245 from Kipps (65E) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock |
|
|