Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 670   11/1891
LNER (1924) 9670   09/1924
LNER (1946) 5242   10/1946
BR 65242   03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3611/1891
J3601/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4389
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal During 08/1957 off Kittybrewster (61A)
Scrapping During 11/1957 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 65 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAW Hawick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 26/12/1953
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 21/01/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1957
61A Kittybrewster 8w/e 31/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 24/12/1955
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 2w/e 26/08/1957
WDN   26/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
01/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 670
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4389
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
01/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
01/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9670    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5242    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65242    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 65242 from Kittybrewster (61A)    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
11/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev