Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 476 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 476 Week
» 15187 Month
» 157141 Year
» 1041522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 669 m/e 11/1891
LNER (1924) 9669 m/e 09/1924
LNER (1946) 5241 m/e 10/1946
BR 65241 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3611/1891
J3612/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4388
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 70 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 17/01/1959
65E Kipps 4w/e 13/02/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 17/01/1959
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 13/02/1960
WDN   w/e 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 669
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4388
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9669    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5241    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65241    
17/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65241 from Kipps (65E)    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev