Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 741 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5935 Week
» 12986 Month
» 235387 Year
» 1119768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 667 m/e 10/1891
LNER (1924) 9667 m/e 09/1924
LNER (1946) 5239 m/e 11/1946
BR 65239 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3610/1891
J3612/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4386
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal Wed 04/01/1961 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 69 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 4w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn 04/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   04/01/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
12/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 667
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4386
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9667    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5239    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65239    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65239 from Parkhead (65C)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev