Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 663 m/e 10/1891
LNER (1924) 9663 m/e 03/1926
LNER (1946) 5237 m/e 09/1946
BR 65237 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3610/1891
J3605/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4382
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/11/1962 off Carlisle Canal (12C)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 71 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FW Fort William 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 4w/e 06/07/1957
12C Carlisle Canal w/e 13/12/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 10/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FTW   m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 15/06/1957
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 20/12/1958
LOAN 12C Carlisle Canal 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 17/01/1959
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 5w/e 31/01/1959
WDN   w/e 10/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
05/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 663
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4382
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9663    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5237    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fort William (FW)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65237    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
10/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65237 from Carlisle Canal (12C)    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev