Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 911 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7918 Week
» 14052 Month
» 241936 Year
» 1463501 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 68 m/e 12/1891
LNER (1924) 9068 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 5247 m/e 07/1946
BR 65247 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1891
J3607/1914
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1891
Withdrawal Fri 17/07/1959 off Kittybrewster (61A)
Scrapping During 11/1959 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 67 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1891
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 29/11/1952
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 07/08/1954
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 8w/e 31/08/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 21/12/1957
   Withdrawn 17/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KPS Kipps m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC KIT Kittybrewster w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   17/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1914 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
07/1914 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
04/1925 Vacuum Ejector fitted
05/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
05/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Cowlairs Works The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. SLS/194702

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1891 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 68
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1914 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1914 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1925 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9068    
05/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
05/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5247    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65247    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
21/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
17/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65247 from Kittybrewster (61A)    

prev prev