Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 882 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7889 Week
» 14023 Month
» 241907 Year
» 1463472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 660 m/e 08/1891
LNER (1924) 9660 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 5236 m/e 06/1946
BR 65236 m/e 03/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1919 HORNE (removed 03/1946)
03/1948 HORNE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3608/1891
J3610/1913
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1891
Withdrawal Fri 06/04/1956 off St Margarets (STM)
Scrapping During 05/1956 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 64 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1891
   Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD m/e 10/1917
   Returned from Service with the WD/ROD m/e 06/1919
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 06/04/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   06/04/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1913 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
10/1913 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/05/1948 Eastfield MPD On 2/5, Nos. 62482 Glen Mamie and 69187 were noted here lettered 'British Railways,' the latter having the number on the bunker above the L.N.E.R. cast number plate. These are the first two ex N.B.R. engines noted from Cowlairs lettered 'British Railways' and carrying the new numbers, previous types so noted being of classes 'B.1,' 'D.11,' and 'K.2.' On 18/4, 'J.36' No. 65236 (late 9660) was noted here ex shops with its name Horne restored in proper shaded transfer letters, but still lettered L.N.E.R., No. 5226 (late 9650) has also been noted with the name Haig restored. These are both stationed at Kipps. SLS/194806
30/06/1950 Inverurie Works Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. SLS/195008
31/07/1950 Inverurie Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1891 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 660
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1913 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1913 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1917 Allocation      
06/1919 Allocation      
06/1919 Naming Named 'HORNE'    
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9660    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5236    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
03/1948 Naming Renamed 'HORNE'    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65236    
06/04/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 65236 from St Margarets (STM)    

prev prev