Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 101 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 20790 Month
» 269083 Year
» 1153464 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 658 m/e 07/1891
LNER (1924) 9658 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 5234 m/e 09/1946
BR 65234 m/e 03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1891
J3605/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1891
Withdrawal Sat 22/04/1967 off Millerhill (64A)
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 75 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 5w/e 26/09/1964
   Withdrawn 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 658
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9658    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5234    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65234    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
22/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65234 from Millerhill (64A)    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev