Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 165 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2026 Week
» 23008 Month
» 164962 Year
» 1049343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 657 m/e 07/1891
LNER (1924) 9657 m/e 07/1924
LNER (1946) 5233 m/e 06/1946
BR 65233 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1919 PLUMER (removed 05/1944)
12/1945 PLUMER (removed 11/1946)
08/1948 PLUMER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1891
J3611/1913
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1891
Withdrawal During 12/1960 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 69 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD m/e 10/1917
   Returned from Service with the WD/ROD m/e 05/1919
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64G Hawick 4w/e 22/11/1958
64F Bathgate 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64G Hawick 4w/e 22/11/1958
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   02/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1913 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
11/1913 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 657
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1913 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1913 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1917 Allocation      
05/1919 Allocation      
05/1919 Naming Named 'PLUMER'    
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9657    
12/1945 Naming Renamed 'PLUMER'    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5233    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
08/1948 Naming Renamed 'PLUMER'    
08/1948 Naming Renamed 'PLUMER'    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65233    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
12/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    
12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65233 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev