Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 871 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5824 Week
» 21803 Month
» 217257 Year
» 1101638 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 656 m/e 07/1891
LNER (1924) 9656 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 5232 m/e 10/1946
BR 65232 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1891
J3603/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 07/1891
Withdrawal Mon 02/10/1961 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 08/1962 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 70 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAW Hawick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 8w/e 22/12/1956
65E Kipps 4w/e 12/03/1960
   Withdrawn 02/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 12/03/1960
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
03/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 656
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9656    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5232    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65232    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65232 from Kipps (65E)    
08/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev