Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 654 m/e 05/1891
LNER (1924) 9654 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 5230 m/e 11/1946
BR 65230 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3605/1891
J3610/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1891
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at P.W. McLellan (Langloan)
Service Life 71 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 4w/e 24/10/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 24/10/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
10/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 654
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9654    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5230    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65230    
24/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
03/06/1962 Sightings At Bo'ness: In store SLS 7/1962 Link
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65230 from Parkhead (65C)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by McLellans: Langloan    

prev prev