Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 926 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7933 Week
» 14067 Month
» 241951 Year
» 1463516 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 653 m/e 05/1891
LNER (1924) 9653 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 5229 m/e 10/1946
BR 65229 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3605/1891
J3612/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1891
Withdrawal Fri 06/05/1960 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 69 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1891
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 06/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   06/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
12/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710
31/10/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1891 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 653
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9653    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5229    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65229    
06/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65229 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev