Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 899 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7906 Week
» 14040 Month
» 241924 Year
» 1463489 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 652 m/e 05/1891
LNER (1924) 9652 m/e 02/1926
LNER (1946) 5228 m/e 10/1946
BR 65228 m/e 03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3605/1891
J3601/1917
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1891
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 71 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1891
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1917 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
01/1917 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1950 Inverurie Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. SLS/195010
06/07/1961 Cowlairs Works (Works Shunters) Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1891 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 652
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
01/1917 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
01/1917 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9652    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5228    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65228    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65228 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev