Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16004 Week
» 69020 Month
» 188547 Year
» 3215400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
652 |
m/e |
05/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9652 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5228 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65228 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 off Eastfield (65A) |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1891 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1917 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
01/1917 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. |
SLS/195010 |
06/07/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Works Shunters) |
Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. |
SLS/196108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 652 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9652 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5228 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65228 |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65228 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|