Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 826 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19737 Week
» 84691 Month
» 287355 Year
» 3314208 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
651 |
m/e |
05/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9651 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5227 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65227 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 11/08/1961 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1919 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
06/1919 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/11/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
Awaiting shopping or being shopped: 44283, 44319/24, 57251, 64564, 64812, 73106. Awaiting scrapping: 55200/2. Scrapped: 40574/9/94, 40603/48, 43883, 55236, 57349/56/73, 57554, 64534/65, 65227, 68459/71 remains. Ex-Works: 57611. |
SLS/196112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 651 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9651 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5227 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65227 |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
11/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65227 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|